LADYHILL PARK

Charity number: 523506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PARK

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CITY OF BRADFORD MDC Trustee
PARK AND CHILDREN'S PLAYGROUND
Received: On time
THE ALFRED EMSLEY MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
ASA BRIGGS RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
NORMAN RAE (OR NORTHCLIFFE) PLAYING FIELDS
Received: On time
LUND PARK KEIGHLEY
Received: On time
GREENWOOD PARK
Received: On time
ODSAL RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £270 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £270 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 December 2024 324 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 February 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRADFORD COUNCIL
UNIT 7
MITRE COURT
CUTLER HEIGHTS LANE
BRADFORD
BD4 9JY
Phone:
07582106135
Website:

No information available