SYWELL OPEN WATER SWIMMING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide open water swimming sessions at the retired reservoir within Sywell Country Park. A small fee is charge but all of our income is used to improve the facilities and provide training to all of our volunteers including lifeguard training and acreditation
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 14 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN CHERRY | Chair | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Redden | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Chisnall | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Wynn-Wernick | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
NINA ROBINSON | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Steven Paul Adams | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|||||
DARREN DAVIES | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
NEIL MCDONALD | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN THE HEALTHY RECREATION OF OPEN WATER SWIMMING THEREBY PROMOTING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND AREAS CLOSE TO SYWELL COUNTRY PARK, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. WORKING WITH AND THROUGH LOCAL AGENCIES TO INCREASE LEVELS OF PARTICIPATION IN OPEN WATER SWIMMING. 2. PROMOTING AND PROVIDING PROGRAMMES TO SUPPORT WATER SAFETY THROUGH ACTIVITIES SUCH AS LIFEGUARD TRAINING IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE ROYAL LIFE SAVING SOCIETY. 3. PROMOTING AND PROVIDING FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR OTHER WATER BASED ACTIVITIES ESPECIALLY AS THEY RELATE TO WATER SAFETY SUCH AS KAYAKING AND PADDLEBOARDING. 4. PROMOTING AND PROVIDING EDUCATION, TRAINING AND COACHING COURSES WHICH PROMOTE SAFE SWIMMING AND ALLOW A GRAVITATION FROM INDOOR TO OUTDOOR SWIMMING. 5. DEVELOP, IN ASSOCIATION WITH SYWELL COUNTRY PARK THE PHYSICAL INFRASTRUCTURE TO IMPROVE THE SAFETY AND QUALITY OF THE SWIMMING EXPERIENCE. 6. PROVIDE TRAINING AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR VOLUNTEERING IN A RANGE OF DIFFERENT ROLES INCLUDING LIFEGUARDING, SWIM SESSION MANAGEMENT, TRAFFIC AND PEOPLE CONTROL AND PROVIDE TRAINING WHERE REQUIRED.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 RECTORY LANE
ORLINGBURY
KETTERING
NN14 1JH
- Phone:
- 07711945963
- Email:
- steve.adamstri@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.