CRICH YOUTH CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To run a weekly youth club at The Glebe Community Centre, Crich that is inclusive for all young people aged 11 to 17 who live in the Crich area. To provide a range of inclusive learning and development activities as identified in consultation with young people that will support their physical, emotional and social needs. To recruit and train volunteers to support the youth club.
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 25 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Mansfield | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Patrcia Sutton | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Patricia Offord | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE JANICE CLEMSON | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Kinghorn | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwendolen Ann Roe | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 FEB 2024 AS AMENDED ON 18 MAR 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11 TO 17 LIVING IN THE VILLAGE OF CRICH, DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAYFLOWER
SNOWDROP VALLEY
CRICH, MATLOCK
Mayflower Cottage
Snowdrop Valley
DE4 5BT
- Phone:
- 07792061489
- Email:
- crichyouthclub@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.