Financial history BRAMLEY VILLAGE TRUST

Charity Number: 523519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £95.39k £66.40k £51.18k £70.15k £71.56k
Total expenditure £86.93k £71.68k £50.07k £76.08k £71.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £50.00k £1.01k