FRYSTON COLLIERY WELFARE RECREATION CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL AND CULTURAL FACILITIES FOR PERSONS WHO ARE, OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE COAL INDUSTRY OR IT'S ALLIED INDUSTRIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 23 May 1966: Standard registration
- FRYSTON MINERS WELFARE CLUB (Working name)
- FRYSTON MINERS WELFARE SCHEME (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL BAINS | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL TAYLOR | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE JONES | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
WAYNE JOHNS | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
KIM COOPER | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Tolson MR | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anthony Owen | Trustee | 14 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN COPLEY MR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REGINALD ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.01k | £31.18k | £41.01k | £33.81k | £29.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.46k | £25.96k | £45.98k | £41.62k | £38.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 25 NOVEMBER 1944 AS VARIED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT NO.1801 (1963) 2. SUPPLEMENTAL LEASE DATED 30 JUNE 1952 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1. A RECREATION SPORTS OR PLEASURE GROUND AND WELFARE INSTITUTE. 2. A WELFARE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FERRY FRYSTPON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 BORROWDALE DRIVE
CASTLEFORD
WF10 2NX
- Phone:
- 01977514322
- Email:
- frystonmw@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window