Trustees THE PMDD PROJECT
Charity number: 1208032
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phoebe Helena Williams | Chair | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Milli Raizada | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Matthews | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLEY CORMACK | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAISIE BLADES | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.