Governing document COOKRIDGE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/12/1964 AS AMENDED ON 02/12/2002 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/2007 AS AMENDED ON 19/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
COOKRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.