THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PRITTLEWELL ST STEPHEN

Charity number: 1207522
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST STEPHEN'S PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Colin Steven Baldwin Chair 29 January 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WESTCLIFF ST PETER
Received: On time
Carol Joan Bennett Trustee 22 March 2025
None on record
Susan Reynolds Trustee 24 February 2024
None on record
Allan David Lassam Trustee 24 February 2024
None on record
Sandra Evelyn Bull Trustee 24 February 2024
None on record
Rev Chukwudum Chimaeze Aguocha Trustee 24 February 2024
None on record
Violet Gene Baldwin Trustee 24 February 2024
None on record
Stephen Leigh Palmer Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
ST. STEPHENS CHURCH
90 ALTON GARDENS
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS2 6QZ
Phone:
01702300402