SILVERWOOD MINERS WELFARE AND RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPORTS ACTIVITIES INCLUDING FOOTBALL, BOWLING, CRICKET, KARATE. WE ALSO PROVIDE A VENUE FOR CHARITABLE FUNCTIONS. COMMUNITY HALL FOR LOCAL PEOPLE TO USE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rotherham
Governance
- 29 June 1964: Standard registration
- SILVERWOOD MINERS AND OFFICIALS WELFARE AND SOCIAL CLUB (Working name)
- SILVERWOOD MINERS WELFARE RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
- DALTON AND THRYBERGH MINERS' RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aileen France | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN EVERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.15k | £56.62k | £52.64k | £54.35k | £56.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.90k | £33.16k | £47.49k | £69.09k | £71.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME 7 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF WORKERS IN AND ABOUT COAL MINES AND OTHERS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DALTON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Silverwood Miners Welfare
Doncaster Road
Dalton
Rotherham
S65 3ES
- Phone:
- 01709854074
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window