HOVE HEBREW COMMUNITY CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jewish charity
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 28 March 2024: CIO registration
- 07 November 2024: Funds received from 1150062 HOVE HEBREW CONGREGATION
- HOVE HEBREW CONGREGATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STANLEY COHEN | Chair | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joel Cohen | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE COHEN | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Winston Hamilton Pickett | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Cherry Doreen Torrance | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ian Andrew Ashleigh | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sharon Jasmin Granville | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CONGREGATION ARE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: - (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY AND ALL OBSERVANCES OF THE JEWISH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RITUALS AND CUSTOMS RECOGNISED BY THE COURT OF THE CHIEF RABBI IN LONDON; (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE JEWISH RELIGION; (III) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND COMMUNAL FUNCTIONS ASSOCIATED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOVE HEBREW COMMUNITY
79 HOLLAND ROAD
HOVE
BN3 1JN
- Phone:
- 01273732035
- Email:
- hollandroadshul@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.