DENBY DALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charities activities are to provide for Denby Dale and the surrounding neighbourhood premises for meetings, lectures, classes and other recreational activities with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £133,561
Total expenditure: £134,535

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gerard Morris Chair 01 August 2019
None on record
Daniel Ibbotson Trustee 18 January 2024
None on record
David Toulcher Trustee 18 January 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £38.51k £59.38k £87.50k £128.36k £133.56k
Total expenditure £21.38k £56.40k £111.06k £103.66k £134.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £39.79k £18.66k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 24 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Denby Dale Pie Hall
297 Wakefield Road
Denby Dale
HUDDERSFIELD
HD8 8RX
Phone:
01484 862895