SHAW CROSS BOYS' CLUB, DEWSBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities, training and discipline in sporting activities, particularly rugby league football. Has long running cultural and sporting exchange with France in which more than 750 young people from the two countries have now taken part. Assists and encourages youngsters to participate in sport and recreation. Interfaces with the local schools & community at large who utilise the facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 26 June 1962: Standard registration
- SHAW CROSS CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE (Working name)
- SHAW CROSS SHARKS ARLFC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRETT JAMES TURNER | Chair | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Webster | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Osborne | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Scargill | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Walker | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ANTONY TURNER | Trustee | 11 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS MORTON HIRD BEM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEAN ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.19k | £123.70k | £118.75k | £242.73k | £427.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.12k | £172.19k | £109.00k | £260.75k | £429.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.00k | £10.00k | N/A | £20.97k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2022
(These accounts |
09 May 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 JULY 1961.
Charitable objects
BOYS' CLUB
Area of benefit
SHAW CROSS, DEWSBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shaw Cross Club for Young People
Leeds Road
DEWSBURY
WF12 7HP
- Phone:
- 01924463987
- Email:
- brett@ravensport.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window