Financial history DODWORTH MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 523584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £16.16k £19.14k £22.33k £36.61k £38.11k
Total expenditure £13.84k £21.31k £21.55k £36.71k £34.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.54k N/A £14.13k £3.00k