DODWORTH MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Provision of a Recreation Ground for the benefit of the Inhabitants (and in particular, but not exclusively, members of the past Mining Community) of the area of benefit, without distinction of Political, Religious, or other opinions, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said Inhabitants. We incorporate Brass Band,Bowling,Football,Rugby & Boxing/Exercise Gym Facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
Governance
- 21 February 1966: Standard registration
- DODWORTH MINERS WELFARE SCHEME (Working name)
- DODWORTH MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC RICHARDSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Lock | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darren Young | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID COUPLAND | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|||||
STEVEN FEAST | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CARR | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAXWELL SENIOR | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR JACK CARR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.16k | £19.14k | £22.33k | £36.61k | £38.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.84k | £21.31k | £21.55k | £36.71k | £34.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.54k | N/A | £14.13k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 5 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTSS
Area of benefit
DODWORTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
45A HIGH STREET
WELFARE GROUNDS
DODWORTH
BARNSLEY
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
S75 3RF
- Phone:
- 01226294235
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window