FRIENDS OF GRINDLETON SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Undertakes fundraising activities to provide financial support to the children of Grindleton Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 January 2025
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan William Thomson | Chair | 25 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Jessica Louise Thomson | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Natasha Hendrie Stewart | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/01/2025 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 January 2025 | 28 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2025 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OF GRINDLETON SCHOOL
C/O GRINDLETON C OF E SCHOOL
SAWLEY ROAD
GRINDLETON
LANCASHIRE
BB7 4QS
- Phone:
- 07736322299
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window