FOXHILL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds for hospitals, other charities, local pensioners and children, annual trips and charity nights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 July 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danielle Hall | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Andrews | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Hawkes | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Howe | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Manning | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
elaine cook | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Glaves | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brooke Cassinelli | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Hawkes | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
gary cook | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
lily pitts | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carl Shepherd | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.74k | £58.35k | £67.41k | £69.69k | £58.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.13k | £53.05k | £75.02k | £66.97k | £80.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 April 2025 | 452 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 April 2025 | 452 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2024 | 645 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2024 | 645 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
01 December 2021 | 304 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED IN OCTOBER, 1965 as amended on 22 Jul 1984 as amended on 09 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
FOR ESTABLISHING A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE WELFARE AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
FOXHILL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Foxhill DCA
Keats Road
SHEFFIELD
S6 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01142353000
- Email:
- info.hartsimpson@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window