MARTYRS MEMORIAL AND CHURCH OF ENGLAND TRUST

Charity Number: 1210949
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. By the appointment of clergy to positions in local Church of England parishes. The trustees arrange and participate in national processes to find, recruit and appoint incumbent level clergy to the parishes for which the charity is responsible. 2. By the support of participating schools in England with an Evangelical ethos through appointment of governors, governance oversight, grants

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 November 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Canon Gary John Jenkins Chair 23 January 2007
None on record
Rev John Leonard Walter Hookway Trustee 17 July 2024
THE ST ALBANS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WARE
Received: On time
WARE (SKILLMAN) CHARITY
Received: On time
REV ADAM DENLEY Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
REVEREND MATTHEW CHARLES BRAILSFORD Trustee 17 July 2024
CAROLINE TURNER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, NORTH FERRIBY
Received: On time
Rev Canon Ian Richard Parkinson Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Catherine Evelyn Ruth Stevenson Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Suzanne Elizabeth Dent Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Rev Jitesh Krisnakant Patel Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Rev MARK DAVID WALLACE Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, COLCHESTER
Received: On time
RT REVD Alistair James Magowan Trustee 18 March 2016
THE MAGOWAN TRUST
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Andrew Nicholas Perry Trustee 01 April 2009
POOLE MISSIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Received: 133 days late
VISCOUNT PORTMAN'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Ross Fulton Johnstone Trustee 11 May 2005
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
C P A S
SOVEREIGN COURT
1 SIR WILLIAM LYONS ROAD
UNIVERSITY OF WARWICK SCIENCE PARK
COVENTRY
CV4 7EZ
Phone:
02475267843
Website:

No information available