GREEN HAMMERTON RECREATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GHRC Board manages and maintains the Village Hall and playing field. The charity organises entertainment and recreational opportunities throughout the year, often working with other local groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 18 November 1963: Standard registration
- GREEN HAMMERTON RECREATIONAL CHARITY (Working name)
- GREEN HAMMERTON READING AND RECREATION ROOM (Previous name)
- READING AND RECREATION ROOM (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Flint | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN BAILES | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
TOM POLITO | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Hymas | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.92k | £25.54k | £22.62k | £19.03k | £24.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.30k | £27.92k | £22.08k | £23.68k | £31.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.63k | £9.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 28 JANUARY 2004 as amended on 04 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
(1) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE,TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION. (2) SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSE 25 OF THIS SCHEME THE LAND NUMBERED 1 IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY INHABITANTS.(3) THE LAND NUMBERED 2 AND 3 IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE AS A RECREATION GROUND OR PLAYING FIELD FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS..
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GREEN HAMMERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SMITHY
BERNARD LANE
GREEN HAMMERTON
YORK
YO26 8BP
- Phone:
- 01423 331544
- Email:
- trustee2@ghrc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window