PENTRAETH MEMORIAL HALL / NEUADD GOFFA PENTRAETH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The memorial hall is used by the following - Classes for Yoga; Fitness and Wellbeing; Boxing/kickboxing. Tennis coaching; Football Club; Cyclecross; Celebration/birthday parties;Weddings; Warm spaces; Residents meetings; Baby and Toddler Group; Community Council Meetings; Voting; Film company; County Council Housing Association; Bouncy Castle Company; Xmas/Tabletop Fairs; Fund raising concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 25 June 1963: Standard registration
- PENTRAETH MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- PENTRAETH VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin John Mawdesley | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DRIVER | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Christine Gillett | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.36k | £14.97k | £17.02k | £6.50k | £7.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.07k | £4.29k | £26.97k | £4.99k | £12.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | £10.77k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 31 DECEMBER 1948
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOM, LIBRARY, LECTURES CLASSES RECREATION AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF PENTRAETH IN THE COUNTY OF ANGLESEY AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS SUBJECT TO THE PROVISION OF THE PRESENTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF PENTRAETH AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pentraeth Memorial Hall
Ffordd Beaumaris
Pentraeth
Anglesey
LL75 8YH
- Phone:
- 01248450112
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window