CENTRAL METHODIST CHURCH HELSTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Central Methodist Church Helston provides a place of worship and space for community activities including Christian teaching, pastoral care, welfare, education and assistance to people in need of help.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- 25 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Daniel Paul Reed | Chair | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lorna Morrison | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mae Wardell | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Harvey | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Joy Hallows | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
EDNA MAY ANGOVE | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Julie English | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Carpenter | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Esther Rose Deakin BSc Hons | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Smith | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE REED | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Mary Hosking | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Margaret Lewis | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Hayward | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Reed | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Loyau- Kennett | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Pascoe | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Ferris | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Smith | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID COLIN COMBELLACK | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rogers | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ESTELLE TURNER | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Janet Dorothy Palmer | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Thomas Reed | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Hendy Triggs | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DENIS BILKEY | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Pascoe | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Didlick | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Simon Turner | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Henry Gibson MBBS MRCGP | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Triggs | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Dower | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kingston | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Combellack | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive King | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Bernard Carter | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY WEARNE | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CENTRAL METHODIST CHURCH
COINAGEHALL STREET
HELSTON
TR13 8EL
- Phone:
- 01326561140
- Email:
- clericalsw@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.