THE ERWOOD MARKET HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Erwood Market Hall provides a meeting place for local groups and a base for activities to be undertaken.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
Governance
- 13 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ATKINS | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mr Alan Pryce | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|||||
WENDY DAWN POWELL | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRYNMOR POWELL | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROGER RAYMOND THORNHILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROB JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH AVON DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.91k | £4.56k | £10.79k | £5.85k | £5.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.45k | £3.60k | £15.68k | £6.72k | £6.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 April 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 10 August 2021 | 497 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AND CONSTITUTION DATED 2 AUGUST 1960 AS AMENDED 10 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF GWENDDWR AND CRICKADARN (INCLUDING THE VILLAGE OF ERWOOD) IN THE COUNTY OF BRECKNOCK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF GWENDDWR AND CRICKADARN (INCLUDING THE VILLAGE OF ERWOOD)
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Manse
Erwood
BUILTH WELLS
Powys
LD2 3EQ
- Phone:
- 01982560327
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window