TRANSPARENT HANDS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Transparent Hands raises funds through an online crowdfunding platform to provide surgical and medical treatments to underprivileged patients in developing countries. Besides helping thousands with free surgeries and medical treatments, the organization also arranges free medical camps in impoverished, remote, and rural areas.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Pakistan
Governance
- 19 June 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naila Jabeen | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Moez Ahmed | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RAMEEZA MUEEN | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ali Zulfiqar Qazi | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 OCT 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 MAR 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN PAKISTAN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT THAT THEY WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE TO AFFORD AND TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LABS ATRIUM
CHALK FARM ROAD,
LONDON
NW1 8AH
- Phone:
- 07771421655
- Email:
- info@transparenthands.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.