Accounts and annual returns Neuadd Goffa

Charity number: 523696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 January 2021 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required