Financial history Neuadd Goffa

Charity number: 523696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.61k £13.69k £4.60k £12.57k £10.47k
Total expenditure £12.08k £5.17k £5.54k £10.84k £10.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £10.00k N/A £4.20k N/A