Accounts and annual returns THE KETTLEWELL VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 523739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 August 2024 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 August 2024 296 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 April 2022 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required