Financial history THE KETTLEWELL VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 523739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.56k £12.38k £21.75k £25.68k £9.39k
Total expenditure £19.23k £7.73k £11.07k £14.62k £6.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £17.30k £2.67k N/A