HOUGHTON MAIN RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To actively promote and improve the Social well being, sports and recreational activities for the local community, and surrounding areas. To ensure lasting improvements to a valuable community asset and facilitate community involvement to enable the development of new initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 December 2021
Total income includes £16,097 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
Governance
- 09 March 1962: Standard registration
- HOUGHTON MAIN MINERS WELFARE (Working name)
- HOUGHTON MAIN MINERS WELFARE SPORTS AND SOCIAL ORGANISATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ernest Heseltine | Chair | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Cutmore | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Colin Ward | Trustee | 14 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/12/2017 | 28/12/2018 | 28/12/2019 | 28/12/2020 | 28/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.47k | £22.59k | £29.32k | £38.94k | £27.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.53k | £17.30k | £24.97k | £24.60k | £25.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.32k | N/A | N/A | £13.72k | £16.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days | |
Annual return | 28 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days | |
Annual return | 28 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 December 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 December 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 23 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
LITTLE HOUGHTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
Middlecliffe Lane
Little Houghton
Barnsley
S72 0HU
- Phone:
- 07594663896
- Email:
- trading@ciswo.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window