MICKLEFIELD RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide football pitch, training pitch and changing rooms/showers, multi-use skate park (bikes, skates and boards), play area for 8-15 year olds, rugby training goal and MUGA for 5-a-side football, netball, basketball and tennis. Provide an area of wooded copse with bat and bird boxes and wildlife area, wildflower meadow and a general open, grassed amenity area for informal recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 26 September 1963: Standard registration
- MICKLEFIELD MINERS WELFARE SCHEME (Working name)
- MICKLEFIELD RECREATION GROUND AND INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICKLEFIELD PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee | 12 May 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.38k | £2.53k | £2.64k | £4.12k | £3.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.53k | £2.40k | £1.68k | £2.54k | £3.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 3RD MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
OBJECT OF THE CHARITY: (1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AOB WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL , RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND. (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
MICKLEFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CHURCHVILLE AVENUE
MICKLEFIELD
LEEDS
LS25 4AS
- Phone:
- 01132875829
- Email:
- clerk@micklefield-pc.gov.uk
- Website:
-
clerk@micklefield-pc.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window