LEWISHAM PARK YOUTH CLUB

Charity Number: 523783
Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Lewisham Park Youth Club provides activities for young people in the town of Morley. Age related activities are provided through club sessions which will help young people develop their physical, social, spiritual and moral capacities. The club works with the local community to improve the welfare of the neighbourhood and contribute to young people become good citizens and responsible adults.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £1,539
Total expenditure: £1,326

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 December 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ENID BARSTOW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £1.72k £1.72k £2.51k £1.21k £1.54k
Total expenditure £1.52k £1.52k £2.43k £1.23k £1.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lewisham Park Centre
Clough Street
Morley
Leeds
LS27 8RW
Phone:
01132520724
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available