Governing document CANCESTRY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 APR 2024 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 MAY 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 JUL 2024
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) FACILITATING THE PREVENTION AND MANAGEMENT OF HEREDITARY CANCERS; AND (B) FACILITATING ACCESS TO INFORMATION AND SERVICES NEEDED TO SUPPORT MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE AT INCREASED RISK OF HEREDITARY CANCERS AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.