Financial history OLD POOL BANK VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 523802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.92k £13.47k £17.48k £10.99k £11.04k
Total expenditure £15.77k £22.03k £9.90k £12.59k £22.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.50k £10.10k N/A N/A