SHEFFIELD PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING SERVICES OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP. PREACHING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND TEACHING CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE. PROVIDING MEANS TO ALLOW BELIEVERS TO PRACTISE THEIR FAITH AND APPLY CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE. MAKING AVAILABLE LITERATURE EXPLAINING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND HOW TO FIND OUT MORE ABOUT IT. DISTRIBUTION OF COPIES OF THE HOLY BIBLE. SHOWING PRACTICAL CHRISTIAN CHARITY TO THOSE IN NEED.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 April 2024: Standard registration
- TRINITY PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev. Dr Kevin Bidwell | Chair | 02 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr Aliyuda Ali | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Agrippa Mtukwa | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev NORMAN GREEN | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
KEVIN MCGRANE | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 MAR 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SUBORDINATE STANDARDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 Westley Road
Bury St. Edmunds
IP33 3SA
- Phone:
- 07818402536
- Email:
- mcgranehome@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.