Accounts and annual returns ROTHERHAM WEST (BRINSWORTH) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 523820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2025 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2025 729 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 March 2023 394 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 March 2023 759 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required