Financial history RYHILL AND HAVERCROFT JOINT RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523826
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £252.76k £231.39k £227.70k £261.63k £1.38k
Total expenditure £250.28k £245.41k £228.69k £249.83k £21.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £43.06k N/A