Accounts and annual returns ROWEN MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 523846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 February 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 April 2022 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 April 2022 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required