Financial history ABERYSTWYTH UNIT 411 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 523851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.93k £2.46k £874 £11.85k £3.81k
Total expenditure £5.39k £4.56k £3.46k £6.57k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A