Accounts and annual returns TALGARREG MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 523874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 March 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 May 2022 98 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 February 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required