MOSAIC GLOBAL EMPOWERMENT FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 06 January 2025: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zalmai Darayi | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mariam Azizi Miss | Trustee | 12 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Philip Game | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Cecil | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Serpil Yilmaz | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02 APR 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 DEC 2024
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: 2.1.1 TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BUT IN PARTICULAR IN AFGHANISTAN AND CENTRAL ASIA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) WORKING WITH RELEVANT ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS TO MONITOR ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; B) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; C) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; D) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; E) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; F) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; G) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; H) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; I) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; J) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; K) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND L) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. 2.1.2 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE MULTI-CULTURAL NATURE OF AFGHANISTAN AND CENTRAL ASIA. 2.1.3 THE RELIEF OF NEED OF PEOPLE IN AFGHANISTAN AND CENTRAL ASIA, AND REFUGEES RESIDING IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THOSE FROM AFGHANISTAN AND CENTRAL ASIA, BY REASON OF YOUTH, SEX, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION, PROMOTION OR SUPPORT OF HUMANITARIAN SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT, EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES, ECONOMIC EMPOWERMENT AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS. 2.2 NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD "CHARITABLE" OR THE WORDS "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mosaic Global Empowerment
71-75 SHELTON STREET
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 02036495969
- Email:
- info@mosaicafghanistan.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.