Trustees ASSEMBLY ROOMS
Charity number: 523898

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Thomas Logsdail | Chair | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Burgess | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ella Peel | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles David Carter | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Howard Burgess | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Cllr SARAH GEORGINA JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELIZABETH ANN THOMAS | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILIAM IVOR HAYDN HUDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.