Place Matters CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We enable diverse people and organisations to come together and collaborate within a place to act on the things that matter to them. We share learning and inspiration between places to build a wider movement for change that will enable communities to thrive. We seek to influence local, regional and national systems (government, NHS, funders) to make the changes that communities want to see.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 November 2024: CIO registration
- PLACE MATTERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Randle | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jordan OBE | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME DUNCAN | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Weaver | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Nov 2024 as amended on 24 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE EFFECTIVENESS OF COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING ORGANISATIONS, THROUGH: (A) DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT SUCH MEMBERS ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; (B) PROMOTING OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND, (C) ADVANCING EDUCATION THROUGH CARRYING OUT RESEARCH, DELIVERING TRAINING, SUPPORT SERVICES AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY NETWORK TO ENABLE COMMUNITY-LED OR BASED APPROACHES TO IMPROVE LOCAL NEIGHBOURHOODS AND COMMUNITIES. (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, UNEMPLOYMENT, OR THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE THE ‘VOLUNTARY SECTOR’ MEANS TO PROMOTE BODIES WHICH ARE FORMALLY CONSTITUTED, INDEPENDENT OF (CENTRAL AND LOCAL) GOVERNMENT, SELF-GOVERNING, NOT PROFIT DISTRIBUTING, PRIMARILY NON-BUSINESS AND THAT BENEFIT FROM VOLUNTARISM. NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Great Portland Street
First Floor
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 07930207944
- Email:
- admin@placematters.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.