CROSSPOOL AND DISTRICT YOUTH SPORTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide outdoor & indoor recreational space to local youth & in supporting this aim to local adult & community groups - to develop their social & physical skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 19 June 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Barnett | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Birch | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Shirt | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Beaumont | Trustee | 19 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.72k | £34.20k | £42.06k | £26.26k | £27.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.69k | £21.55k | £39.21k | £17.15k | £40.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 NOVEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
HELPING AND EDUCATING BOYS AND GIRLS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES, TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONIDITONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF CROSSPOOL, IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
C D Y S T
Coldwell Lane
SHEFFIELD
S10 5TJ
- Phone:
- 07711 139948
- Email:
- daveb@cdyst.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window