Financial history DINNINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523912
Charity reporting is up to date (325 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £276.85k £240.73k £154.06k £726.56k £558.61k
Total expenditure £269.52k £225.34k £147.96k £196.97k £316.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.47k
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £98.72k £14.47k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £550.11k £242.88k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £6.66k £2.49k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £169.76k £312.65k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £25 £593
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £196.97k £316.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £45.32k £45.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0