DINNINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and the maintenance of the community centre and recreation ground for the use of the inhabitants of Dinnington, and the surrounding neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £16,524 from 2 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rotherham
Governance
- 13 March 1961: Standard registration
- DINNINGTON RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE ANN HAVENHAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Kathleen Aimes | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
John Thomas Ireland | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Andrew Tweed | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Roy Morton | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Tim Chapman | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Jeanette Mallinder | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|||||||
Partrick Joseph Nelis | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Zoe Lowe | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Ravenhall | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.73k | £154.06k | £726.56k | £558.61k | £413.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.34k | £147.96k | £196.97k | £316.46k | £388.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.47k | £16.52k | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £98.72k | £14.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £550.11k | £242.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £6.66k | £2.49k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £169.76k | £312.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £25 | £593 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £196.97k | £316.46k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £45.32k | £45.56k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 325 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 August 2024 | 479 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 August 2024 | 479 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 May 2023 | 396 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 31 May 2023 | 396 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND. (2) SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSES 23 AND 25 THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART ONE OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DINNINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
131 LAUGHTON ROAD
DINNINGTON
SHEFFIELD
S25 2PP
- Phone:
- 01909518555
- Email:
- darroncrookes@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
dinningtonresourcecentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window