SICKLINGHALL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide a facility for the whole village population including playgroup, party venue, and other activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 February 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN BRADY | Chair | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Perry | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dent | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
DONALD DEVENISH | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD WEBSDALE | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE LEAHY | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HARDLESS | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS S CALLINAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.94k | £15.60k | £14.42k | £13.38k | £13.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.41k | £12.12k | £12.53k | £11.42k | £12.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.08k | £10.00k | N/A | £850 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 15TH AUGUST 1952
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOM, LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUSOR OTHER OPINIONS SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THESE PRESENTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SICKLINGHALL AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sicklinghall Village Hall
Main Street
Sicklinghall
Wetherby
LS22 4AU
- Phone:
- 0193758
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window