SOUTH KIRKBY MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sport and recreational facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 10 January 1962: Standard registration
- SOUTH KIRKBY MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alec Brown | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Maguire | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Bannister | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Johnson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Whitehouse | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE HARRISON | Trustee | 17 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.17k | £64.76k | £76.49k | £104.23k | £119.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.72k | £81.33k | £105.94k | £118.57k | £116.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25TH FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SOUTH KIRKBY AND MOORTHORPE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH KIRKBY WELFARE CLUB
STOCKINGATE
SOUTH KIRKBY
PONTEFRACT
WEST YORKSHIRE
WF9 3DP
- Phone:
- 01977643438
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window