SWINTON RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Land is maintained as a recreation ground and contains football pitches which are used for Adult & Junior football, a bowling green and multi-use-games-area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rotherham
Governance
- 28 September 1965: Standard registration
- SWINTON MINERS' RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SWINTON COMMUNITY SPORTS GROUND TRUST LIMITED | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Billups | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2019 | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.64k | £21.65k | £44.10k | £7.27k | £20.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.83k | £8.57k | £39.82k | £16.84k | £25.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.43k | £17.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 5TH FEBRUARY 2002 WILL GOVERN THIS CHARITY
Charitable objects
IS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
SWINTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 Newsam Road
Kilnhurst
MEXBOROUGH
S64 5UN
- Phone:
- 07734963607
- Email:
- SCSGT@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window