THE THORPE HESLEY AND SCHOLES O.A.P. AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Centre for O.A.P's & general community use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
Governance
- 26 February 1964: Standard registration
- THORPE HESLEY AND SCHOLES OAP AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- THE THORPE HESLEY AND SCHOLES O.A.P. AND COMMUNITY CETRE (Previous name)
- THORPE AND SCHOLES OLD PEOPLE'S CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WALLACE HIBLE FCMA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ELSIE JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.70k | £8.08k | £7.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.83k | £8.53k | £8.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 930 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 930 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1295 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1295 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1660 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1660 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 3 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF AN OLD PEOPLE'S CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THORPE, HESLEY AND SCHOLES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 SOUGH HALL ROAD
THORPE HESLEY
ROTHERHAM
S61 2QP
- Phone:
- 01142213915
- Email:
- psander722@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window