PULP FRICTION SMOOTHIE BAR CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pulp Friction Smoothie Bar CIO supports adults with Learning Disabilities and or Autism to develop their social, work readiness and independent living skills through a variety of activities that are person centered and focus on catering and hospitality, gardening and horticulture, social events such as running a choir. We work in Nottinghamshire and Nottingham City.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 02 August 2024: CIO registration
- 23 January 2025: Funds received from 1185532 FRIENDZ & CO.
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Dawn PILLAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kamalakkannan Chokkalingam | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Jane Pownall | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jon EMMOTT | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessie CARTER-KAY | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terence Richard MAXWELL | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jill Carter MBE | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF A LEARNING DISABILITY (AND OR AUTISM) BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AS WILL ENABLE THEM TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP SOCIAL, INDEPENDENT LIVING AND EMPLOYABILITY SKILLS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. "LEARNING DISABILITY" MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE AND INCLUDES AUTISM
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 St. Michaels Square
Bramcote
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 3HG
- Phone:
- 07794676398
- Email:
- pulpfrictionceo@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.