Accounts and annual returns THURCROFT INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 523969
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 April 2025 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 May 2025 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 March 2025 421 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 March 2025 421 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 February 2023 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 February 2023 380 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2023 745 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 February 2023 745 days late Download Open in new window