THURNSCOE (COMMON ROAD) MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recreation ground
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
Governance
- 19 August 1964: Standard registration
- THURNSOE (COMMON ROAD) MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barnsley Metropolitan Borough Council | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.88k | £2.83k | £3.08k | £2.84k | £3.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.88k | £2.83k | £3.08k | £2.84k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 8TH SEPTEMBER, 1931
Charitable objects
RECREATION OF PLEASURE GROUND (MINER'S INSTITUTE) OR OTHER BUILDINGS TO BE ESTABLISHED UPON THE DESCRIBED PROPERTY FOR THE USE THEREOF BY THE PUBLIC; FOR THE SOCIAL WELL-BEING AND RECREATION OF WORKERS IN OR ABOUT COAL MINES IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THURNSCOE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barnsley MBC - Legal Services
PO Box 634
Barnsley
S70 9GG
- Phone:
- 07900 761 052
- Email:
- jasonfield2@barnsley.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window